IA HF2645 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Bousselot.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Bousselot.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Mississippi river parkway commission.(Formerly HF 2529.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Mississippi river parkway commission.(Formerly HF 2529.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Bousselot. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 593. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 593. |
2024-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 623. |
2024-03-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 633. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 615. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-03-12 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 533. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2529 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.