IA HF2666 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the farm tenancy net income exclusion available against the individual income tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 2503.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the farm tenancy net income exclusion available against the individual income tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 2503.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 895. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/10/2024 8:00AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/08/2024 2:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Sweeney, and T. Taylor. S.J. 741. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 722. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 722. |
2024-04-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 713. |
2024-04-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 737. |
2024-04-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 713. |
2024-04-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 706. |
2024-03-21 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-20 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 627. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2503 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.