IA HF311 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to water quality. (Formerly HSB 72) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act relating to water quality. (Formerly HSB 72) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 943. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 809. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 801. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 799. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, without recommendation. S.J. 622. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Schoenjahn, Greiner, and Seng. S.J. 484. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 481. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 481. |
2013-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 486. |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 88, nays 12. H.J. 475. |
2013-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1058 adopted. H.J. 475. |
2013-03-11 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1063 to amendment H-1058. H.J. 475. |
2013-03-11 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1063 to amendment H-1058 not germane. H.J. 475. |
2013-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1063 to amendment H-1058 filed. H.J. 475. |
2013-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1053 withdrawn. H.J. 475. |
2013-03-07 | House | Amendment H-1058 filed. H.J. 451. |
2013-02-27 | House | Amendment H-1053 filed. H.J. 385. |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 351. |