IA HF311 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to provisions applicable to life insurance companies and associations, and credit for reinsurance, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 22.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to provisions applicable to life insurance companies and associations, and credit for reinsurance, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 22.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 678. |
2017-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 644. |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 644. |
2017-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 553. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 525. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 561. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 521. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for SF 231. S.J. 520. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 231. S.J. 391. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 391. |
2017-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 451. |
2017-03-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 504. |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0. H.J. 442. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 276. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB22 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 249.
SSB1040 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF231 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
SSB1040 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF231 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.