IA HF328 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the division of banking of the department of commerce, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 79) Effective 5-03-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the division of banking of the department of commerce, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 79) Effective 5-03-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-05-03 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1158. | |
2011-05-02 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1141. | |
2011-05-02 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1141. | |
2011-04-26 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1127. | |
2011-04-26 | Immediate message. S.J. 1064. | |
2011-04-26 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 1063. | |
2011-04-26 | Amendment S-3263 withdrawn. S.J. 1063. | |
2011-04-19 | Amendment S-3263 filed. S.J. 1026. | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 936. | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 701. | |
2011-03-14 | Subcommittee, Kettering, Dandekar, and Seng. S.J. 673. | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 466. | |
2011-03-03 | Message from House. S.J. 466. | |
2011-03-02 | Immediate message. H.J. 493. | |
2011-03-02 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 492. | |
2011-03-02 | Amendment H-1101 adopted. H.J. 492. | |
2011-03-02 | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 492. | |
2011-03-02 | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1102. H.J. 491. | |
2011-03-02 | Ruled not germane H-1102. H.J. 491. | |
2011-03-02 | Point of order raised H-1102 not germane. H.J. 491. | |
2011-02-28 | Amendments H-1101 and H-1102 filed. H.J. 449. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 369. |