IA HF569 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to personal degradation of a dependent adult as a form of dependent adult abuse by a caretaker regulated by the department of human services, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 112.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to personal degradation of a dependent adult as a form of dependent adult abuse by a caretaker regulated by the department of human services, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 112.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 997. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1090. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1088. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for SF 426. S.J. 1087. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 426. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 794. |
2019-04-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 795. |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 99 nays none. H.J. 793. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1089 adopted. H.J. 792. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment H-1089 filed. H.J. 690. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 377. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1062 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB112 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 365.
SF426 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1088.
HSB112 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 365.
SF426 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1088.