IA HF572 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/03.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/03.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties. (Formerly HF 388.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties. (Formerly HF 388.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/03. |
2024-05-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23. |
2024-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 716. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 711. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 709. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 229. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 4:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Evans, and Knox. S.J. 46. |
2023-12-31 | Senate | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 1092. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 520. S.J. 771. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 771. |
2023-04-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 805. |
2023-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037. |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 87, nays 10. H.J. 788. |
2023-04-11 | House | Amendment H-1147 adopted, as amended. H.J. 788. |
2023-04-11 | House | Amendment H-1159 to amendment H-1147 adopted. H.J. 788. |
2023-04-11 | House | Amendment H-1202 to amendment H-1147 filed, adopted. H.J. 788. |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 746. |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment H-1159 filed. H.J. 727. |
2023-03-21 | House | Amendment H-1147 filed. H.J. 709. |
2023-03-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 480. |
Same As/Similar To
HF388 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
SF369 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 507.
SF520 (Similar To) 2024-01-12 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Knox, and Zumbach. S.J. 103.
SF369 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 507.
SF520 (Similar To) 2024-01-12 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Knox, and Zumbach. S.J. 103.