IA HF624 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled).
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled).
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to operating-while-intoxicated offenses, including temporary restricted licenses and ignition interlock devices, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 217.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to operating-while-intoxicated offenses, including temporary restricted licenses and ignition interlock devices, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 217.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled). |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Meggers, Gustoff and Meyer, B. H.J. 71. |
2023-05-04 | House | Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1030. |
2023-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 501. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB217 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 624.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF624 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF624.html |