IA HJR1 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa to dedicate a portion of state revenue from the tax imposed on certain retail sales of tangible personal property and services for the benefit of the state's natural resources. Effective 7-01-09.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa to dedicate a portion of state revenue from the tax imposed on certain retail sales of tangible personal property and services for the benefit of the state's natural resources. Effective 7-01-09.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-26 | Sent to Secretary of State. H.J. 2128. | |
2009-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 2128. | |
2009-02-18 | Message from Senate. H.J. 423. | |
2009-02-18 | Immediate message. S.J. 325. | |
2009-02-18 | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 1. S.J. 325. | |
2009-02-18 | Substituted for SJR 1. S.J. 323. | |
2009-02-18 | Attached to companion SJR 1. S.J. 320. | |
2009-02-18 | Message from House. S.J. 319. | |
2009-02-17 | Immediate message. H.J. 403. | |
2009-02-17 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 413. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed House, yeas 82, nays 14. H.J. 402. | |
2009-01-28 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 205. | |
2009-01-16 | Subcommittee, Bell, Beard, Deyoe, Rayhons, and Whitaker. H.J. 100. | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 18. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HJR&key=0001C&ga=83 |