IA HSB161 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF597
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee: Hagenow, Brown-Powers and Hein. H.J. 125.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee: Hagenow, Brown-Powers and Hein. H.J. 125.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the sales tax certain items and services sold or furnished to nonprofit blood centers, including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the sales tax certain items and services sold or furnished to nonprofit blood centers, including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Hagenow, Brown-Powers and Hein. H.J. 125. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 11:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Brown-Powers and Windschitl. H.J. 289. |
2019-02-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1114 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF597 (Replaced by) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
SF597 (Replaced by) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB161 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB161.html |