IA HSB191 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF658
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2639
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2639
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 421.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 421.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act increasing certain penalties for speeding in a motor vehicle, providing for the use of the additional moneys, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act increasing certain penalties for speeding in a motor vehicle, providing for the use of the additional moneys, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 421. |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2019 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Paustian and Kacena. H.J. 333. |
2019-02-20 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF658 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 589.
HF2639 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
HF2639 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB191 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB191.html |