IA HSB532 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of medical cannabidiol.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of medical cannabidiol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/16/2024 3:30PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Wilz, H., Meyer, B. and Shipley. H.J. 51. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 47. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB532 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB532.html |