IA HSB537 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2100
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2293
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2293
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2100.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2100.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reinsurance requirements for county and state mutual insurance associations.(See HF 2100.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to reinsurance requirements for county and state mutual insurance associations.(See HF 2100.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2100. |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 112. |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/17/2024 12:30PM RM 304.1. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee: Vondran, Lohse and Scholten. H.J. 52. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 48. |
2024-01-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3083 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2293.
HF2100 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SF2293 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 546.
HF2100 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SF2293 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 546.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB537 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB537.html |