IA HSB679 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2333
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers of educational institutions, political subdivisions, and certain other governmental entities regarding the sale, lease, or transfer of property for educational purposes.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers of educational institutions, political subdivisions, and certain other governmental entities regarding the sale, lease, or transfer of property for educational purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2024 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Johnson, Cahill and Hora. H.J. 216. |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 215. |
2024-02-07 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3112 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2333.
SF2333 (Replaced by) 2024-03-06 - Amendment S-5053 filed. S.J. 460.
SF2333 (Replaced by) 2024-03-06 - Amendment S-5053 filed. S.J. 460.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB679 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB679.html |