IA HSB724 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2024 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled).
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2024 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled).
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of state taxation, the lottery, and alcoholic beverages under the purview of the department of revenue, making appropriations, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of state taxation, the lottery, and alcoholic beverages under the purview of the department of revenue, making appropriations, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2024 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled). |
2024-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2024 11:30AM RM 304 (Cancelled). |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Best and Nielsen. H.J. 363. |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 361. |
2024-02-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB724 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB724.html |