IA SCR1 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Message from House. S.J. 739.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Message from House. S.J. 739.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution relating to the compensation of chaplains, officers, and employees of the eighty-seventh general assembly.
Title
A concurrent resolution relating to the compensation of chaplains, officers, and employees of the eighty-seventh general assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 739. |
2017-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 754. |
2017-03-22 | House | Resolution adopted. H.J. 743. |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 645. |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Administration and Rules. H.J. 149. |
2017-01-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 127. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 135. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted. S.J. 135. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 108. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Resolution filed, referred to Rules and Administration. S.J. 92. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SCR1 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Resolutions/Introduced/SCR1.html |