IA SF116 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act providing that the casual sales exemption under the state sales tax does not apply to the sales of all-terrain vehicles, snowmobiles, off-road motorcycles, and off-road utility vehicles.
Title
A bill for an act providing that the casual sales exemption under the state sales tax does not apply to the sales of all-terrain vehicles, snowmobiles, off-road motorcycles, and off-road utility vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Daryl Beall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-20 | Subcommittee, Bell, Steckman and Wagner. H.J. 1602. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1488. | |
2009-04-15 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1475. | |
2009-04-15 | Immediate message. S.J. 1105. | |
2009-04-15 | Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 20. S.J. 1105. | |
2009-04-15 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 1058. | |
2009-04-06 | Deferred. S.J. 958. | |
2009-04-06 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 929. | |
2009-02-10 | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Bolkcom, and Hamerlinck. S.J. 264. | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 240. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0135B&ga=83 |