IA SF158 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chelgren, Hogg, and Lofgren. S.J. 135.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chelgren, Hogg, and Lofgren. S.J. 135.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the electronic publication of certain public notices by governmental bodies and officers and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the electronic publication of certain public notices by governmental bodies and officers and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Chelgren, Hogg, and Lofgren. S.J. 135. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chelgren, Dvorsky, and Lofgren. S.J. 225. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 170. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF158 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF158.html |