IA SF2109 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the periods of time to bring civil and criminal actions relating to the commission of sex offenses against minors. (Formerly SSB 3112).
Title
A bill for an act modifying the periods of time to bring civil and criminal actions relating to the commission of sex offenses against minors. (Formerly SSB 3112).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Hess, Hagenow, and Oldson. H.J. 379. |
2014-02-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 319. |
2014-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 309. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 317. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 317. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5009 filed, adopted. S.J. 317. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 206. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 201. |