IA SF2148 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 593.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 593.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, requiring the removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3025.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, requiring the removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3025.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Local Government. H.J. 593. |
2018-02-27 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 423. |
2018-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 407. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 463. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 18. S.J. 460. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5028 withdrawn. S.J. 459. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5045 filed, lost. S.J. 459. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5044 filed, lost. S.J. 459. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5030 lost. S.J. 458. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Amendments S-5028 and S-5030 filed. S.J. 425. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 419. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal note, revised. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 199. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 190. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB512 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3025 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2118 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 593.
SSB3025 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2118 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 593.