IA SF2159 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for biomarker testing.(Formerly SSB 3001.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for biomarker testing.(Formerly SSB 3001.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 764. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | HF 2668 substituted. S.J. 763. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5123 adopted. S.J. 763. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-5123 filed. S.J. 755. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Attached to HF 2668. S.J. 666. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 184. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 177. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3001 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2159.