IA SF2169 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 902.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act limiting the liability of an alcoholic beverage licensee or permittee for certain alcohol-related injuries. (Formerly SSB 1179.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act limiting the liability of an alcoholic beverage licensee or permittee for certain alcohol-related injuries. (Formerly SSB 1179.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 902. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 901. |
2018-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 751. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 879. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 17. S.J. 875. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5209. S.J. 875. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 871. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5209. S.J. 846. |
2018-04-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 720. |
2018-04-03 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 732. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed House, ayes 61, nays 36. H.J. 717. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8316 withdrawn. H.J. 716. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8222 withdrawn. H.J. 716. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8218 withdrawn. H.J. 716. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8188 withdrawn. H.J. 716. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8176 withdrawn. H.J. 716. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8341 filed, adopted. H.J. 716. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8223, to H-8184 out of order. H.J. 716. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8184 withdrawn. H.J. 715. |
2018-04-02 | House | Point of order raised on H-8343, ruled not germane. H.J. 715. |
2018-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8175 withdrawn. H.J. 715. |
2018-04-02 | House | Substituted for HF 2391. H.J. 715. |
2018-03-26 | House | Amendment H-8316 filed. H.J. 679. |
2018-03-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendments H-8218, H-8222 and H-8223 filed. H.J. 518. |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8188 filed. H.J. 489. |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8184 filed. H.J. 488. |
2018-03-05 | House | Amendments H-8175 and H-8176 filed. H.J. 461. |
2018-02-23 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 374. |
2018-02-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 354. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 417. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 20. S.J. 417. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5029 filed, lost. S.J. 416. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5027 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 416. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 227. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 225. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1179 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.