IA SF2259 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2440. S.J. 821.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2440. S.J. 821.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa educational savings plan trust by expanding the definition of qualified educational expenses and apprenticeship programs for purposes of withdrawals qualifying for an individual income tax exclusion, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3128; See SF 2440.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa educational savings plan trust by expanding the definition of qualified educational expenses and apprenticeship programs for purposes of withdrawals qualifying for an individual income tax exclusion, and including retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3128; See SF 2440.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Workforce Report (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2440. S.J. 821. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2024 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Dotzler, and Schultz. S.J. 355. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 298. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 263. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3128 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2259.
SF2440 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Message from Senate. H.J. 907.
SF2440 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Message from Senate. H.J. 907.