IA SF2262 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a probation officer's access to confidential information filed with the court for securing an arrest or search warrant. (Formerly SF 2002.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to a probation officer's access to confidential information filed with the court for securing an arrest or search warrant. (Formerly SF 2002.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 809. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 808. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 513. |
2024-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 565. |
2024-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 562. |
2024-03-11 | House | Substituted for HF 2238. H.J. 561. |
2024-02-20 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 322. |
2024-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 321. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 346. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 345. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 257. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2002 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2262. S.J. 257.
HF2058 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HF2238 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HF2058 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HF2238 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.