IA SF2264 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 681.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal identification and criminal history and intelligence data, including fingerprints and palm prints.(Formerly SSB 3017.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal identification and criminal history and intelligence data, including fingerprints and palm prints.(Formerly SSB 3017.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 681. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | HF 2315 substituted. S.J. 680. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Attached to HF 2315. S.J. 405. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 258. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 247. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB525 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2315.
SSB3017 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264.
HF2315 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SSB3017 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264.
HF2315 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.