IA SF2295 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain powers and duties of the department of inspections, appeals, and licensing including confidentiality of information and records, and dependent adult abuse, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 3095.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain powers and duties of the department of inspections, appeals, and licensing including confidentiality of information and records, and dependent adult abuse, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 3095.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 587. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | HF 2390 substituted. S.J. 586. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Attached to HF 2390. S.J. 342. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 260. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 252. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3095 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2295.
HSB596 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2390.
HF2390 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
HSB596 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2390.
HF2390 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.