IA SF2338 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 628.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 628.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the placement of a police officer on a Brady-Giglio list, including the right of a police officer to petition the court and the standard of proof required for actions regarding such placement.(Formerly SF 2200.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the placement of a police officer on a Brady-Giglio list, including the right of a police officer to petition the court and the standard of proof required for actions regarding such placement.(Formerly SF 2200.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 628. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | HF 2592 substituted. S.J. 627. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5092 filed, adopted. S.J. 627. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Attached to HF 2592. S.J. 429. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 290. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 285. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2200 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338. S.J. 290.
HF2295 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.
HF2592 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.
HF2295 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.
HF2592 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.