IA SF234 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 895.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 895.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing an Iowa employment rides initiative and related fund in the state department of transportation. (Formerly SF 110.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing an Iowa employment rides initiative and related fund in the state department of transportation. (Formerly SF 110.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Transportation. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 825. |
2015-03-17 | House | Subcommittee, Best, Carlson, and Finkenauer. H.J. 634. |
2015-02-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 423. |
2015-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 408. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 354. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 352. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3009 filed, adopted. S.J. 352. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 303. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 299. |