IA SF2350 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - Subcommittee, Windschitl, Isenhart, and Sands. H.J. 800.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - Subcommittee, Windschitl, Isenhart, and Sands. H.J. 800.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to payment of wages. (Formerly SSB 3214.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to payment of wages. (Formerly SSB 3214.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Isenhart, and Sands. H.J. 800. |
2014-04-16 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 759. |
2014-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 733. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 779. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 779. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 774. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 754. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 753. |