IA SF2352 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 710.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 710.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the regulation of hemp and hemp products, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 3159.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the regulation of hemp and hemp products, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 3159.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 710. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | HF 2605 substituted. S.J. 709. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5116 filed, adopted. S.J. 709. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Attached to HF 2605. S.J. 517. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 315. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 301. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB665 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2605.
SSB3159 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2352.
HF2605 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Fiscal note.
SSB3159 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2352.
HF2605 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Fiscal note.