IA SF2354 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2420. S.J. 668.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2420. S.J. 668.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the transition of behavioral health services from a mental health and disability services system to a behavioral health service system, and the transfer of disability services to the division of aging and disability services of the department of health and human services, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3146; See SF 2420.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the transition of behavioral health services from a mental health and disability services system to a behavioral health service system, and the transfer of disability services to the division of aging and disability services of the department of health and human services, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3146; See SF 2420.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2420. S.J. 668. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Petersen. S.J. 355. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 320. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 313. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 301. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3146 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354.
HSB653 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2509.
HF2509 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.
HF2673 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - NOBA: Senate Floor
SF2420 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 851.
HSB653 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2509.
HF2509 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.
HF2673 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - NOBA: Senate Floor
SF2420 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 851.