IA SF2355 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 600.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 600.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to processes overseen by the department of health and human services, including internal adoption information sharing, dependent adult abuse matters, juvenile justice court filings, and mandatory reporter training.(Formerly SSB 3124.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to processes overseen by the department of health and human services, including internal adoption information sharing, dependent adult abuse matters, juvenile justice court filings, and mandatory reporter training.(Formerly SSB 3124.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 600. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | HF 2404 substituted. S.J. 599. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5015 adopted. S.J. 598. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Attached to HF 2404. S.J. 350. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5015 filed. S.J. 339. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 314. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 301. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB625 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2404.
SSB3124 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2355.
HF2404 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
SSB3124 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2355.
HF2404 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.