IA SF2358 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for supplemental and diagnostic breast examinations.(Formerly SSB 3135.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for supplemental and diagnostic breast examinations.(Formerly SSB 3135.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 684. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | HF 2489 substituted. S.J. 683. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5077 adopted. S.J. 683. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5077 filed. S.J. 591. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Attached to HF 2489. S.J. 370. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 308. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 302. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3135 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2358.