IA SF2372 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electric transmission lines and electric transmission owners, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3176.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electric transmission lines and electric transmission owners, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3176.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 310. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB698 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2551.
SSB3176 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2372.
HF2551 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Amendment H-8387 filed. H.J. 931.
SSB3176 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2372.
HF2551 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Amendment H-8387 filed. H.J. 931.