IA SF267 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to close clearances and safe spaces around railroad tracks and railroad facilities, and providing penalties and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to close clearances and safe spaces around railroad tracks and railroad facilities, and providing penalties and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-09 | Subcommittee, Iverson, Arnold, and Murphy. H.J. 645. | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 561. | |
2011-03-07 | Message from Senate. H.J. 550. | |
2011-03-07 | Immediate message. S.J. 501. | |
2011-03-07 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 498. | |
2011-03-01 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 444. | |
2011-02-22 | Subcommittee, McCoy, Beall, and Houser. S.J. 372. | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 359. |