IA SF267 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa law enforcement academy council including the revocation or suspension of certifications of law enforcement officers and reserve peace officers, and administrative investigations under the peace officer, public safety, and emergency personnel bill of rights.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa law enforcement academy council including the revocation or suspension of certifications of law enforcement officers and reserve peace officers, and administrative investigations under the peace officer, public safety, and emergency personnel bill of rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 9:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Boulton, and Webster. S.J. 96. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1091. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 501. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Boulton, and Webster. S.J. 323. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 313. |