IA SF271 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2019 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including registration plates and the minimum standard of transparency for window tint, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 88.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including registration plates and the minimum standard of transparency for window tint, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 88.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2019 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
2019-02-22SenateFiscal note.
2019-02-19SenateSubcommittee: Feenstra, Edler, and Wahls. S.J. 344.
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 317.
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 315.
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 308.

Same As/Similar To

SF88 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Reported out of committee as SF 271. S.J. 315.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback