IA SF387 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 531. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 531. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pediatric congenital heart surgery including data reporting and the provision of patient education by hospitals. (See SF 531.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to pediatric congenital heart surgery including data reporting and the provision of patient education by hospitals. (See SF 531.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 531. S.J. 507. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Jochum, and Johnson. S.J. 432. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 402. |
Same As/Similar To
HF430 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
SF531 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
SF531 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF387 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF387.html |