IA SF415 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties. (Formerly SSB 1088.)
Title
A bill for an act providing immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties. (Formerly SSB 1088.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-16 | House | Committee amendment H-8272 filed. H.J. 599. |
2018-03-16 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 599. |
2018-03-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-16 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Koester, McKean and Wolfe. H.J. 105. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 21. |
2017-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1449 filed. H.J. 1144. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1383 filed. H.J. 1076. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 821. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Hein and Wolfe. H.J. 757. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 655. |
2017-03-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 654. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 616. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 615. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 462. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1088 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.