IA SF430 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to violations of the open records and public meetings laws and the creation of the Iowa public information board, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 246.) Various effective dates; see section 17 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to violations of the open records and public meetings laws and the creation of the Iowa public information board, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 246.) Various effective dates; see section 17 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 901. | |
2012-05-01 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 880. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 880. | |
2012-04-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 865. | |
2012-04-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 842. | |
2012-04-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 840. | |
2012-04-23 | Senate concurred with S-5215. S.J. 839. | |
2012-04-17 | Message from House, with amendment S-5215. S.J. 813. | |
2012-04-17 | Immediate message. H.J. 830. | |
2012-04-17 | Passed House, ayes 92, nays 7. H.J. 830. | |
2012-04-17 | Amendment H-8463 filed, adopted. H.J. 829. | |
2012-04-17 | Committee amendment H-8316 adopted. H.J. 829. | |
2012-04-17 | Committee amendment H-8270 as amended, adopted. H.J. 829. | |
2012-04-17 | Amendments H-8454 and H-8304 withdrawn. H.J. 829. | |
2012-04-17 | Amendments H-8374 and H-8405 adopted. H.J. 829. | |
2012-04-17 | Amendment H-8460B adopted. H.J. 829. | |
2012-04-17 | Amendment H-8460A withdrawn. H.J. 828. | |
2012-04-17 | Amendment H-8460 filed. H.J. 828. | |
2012-04-11 | Amendment H-8454 filed. H.J. 807. | |
2012-04-02 | Amendment H-8405 filed. H.J. 714. | |
2012-03-27 | Amendment H-8374 filed. H.J. 671. | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635. | |
2012-03-21 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-03-21 | Committee amendment H-8316 filed. H.J. 631. | |
2012-03-21 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 631. | |
2012-03-21 | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 631. | |
2012-03-21 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 631. | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment H-8304 filed. H.J. 614. | |
2012-03-20 | Subcommittee, Rogers, Gaskill, and Hagenow. H.J. 613. | |
2012-03-15 | Committee amendment H-8270 filed. H.J. 578. | |
2012-03-15 | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 577. | |
2012-03-15 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 577. | |
2012-02-09 | Subcommittee, Rogers, Cownie, Koester, Lensing, and T. Taylor. H.J. 244. | |
2012-02-07 | Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 216. | |
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-05 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2011-04-01 | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 873. | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 873. | |
2011-03-16 | Subcommittee, Koester, Lensing, and Raecker. H.J. 712. | |
2011-03-15 | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 672. | |
2011-03-15 | Message from Senate. H.J. 668. | |
2011-03-14 | Immediate message. S.J. 669. | |
2011-03-14 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 667. | |
2011-03-14 | Amendment S-3101 adopted as amended. S.J. 667. | |
2011-03-14 | Amendment S-3103 filed, adopted. S.J. 667. | |
2011-03-14 | Deferred. S.J. 666. | |
2011-03-14 | Amendment S-3101 filed. S.J. 666. | |
2011-03-14 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2011-03-07 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 520. | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 502. |