IA SF547 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education savings grants for certain pupils attending an accredited nonpublic school or specified public schools, establishing an education savings grant fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 372.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education savings grants for certain pupils attending an accredited nonpublic school or specified public schools, establishing an education savings grant fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 372.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Breitbach, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 619. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 571. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 506. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 502. |
Same As/Similar To
SF372 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 547. S.J. 506.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF547 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF547.html |