IA SF615 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1198.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1198.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1255.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see sections 23, 30, 33, and 37 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1255.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see sections 23, 30, 33, and 37 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1198. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1194. |
2019-04-24 | House | NOBA: Final |
2019-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1002. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1099. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 1098. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3215. S.J. 1098. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3221 to S-3215 filed, lost. S.J. 1098. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3224 to S-3215 filed, lost. S.J. 1097. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3223 to S-3215 filed, lost. S.J. 1096. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3215. S.J. 1079. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-23 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 54 nays 45. H.J. 976. |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee amendment H-1255 out of order. H.J. 976. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1271 adopted. H.J. 976. |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 976. |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of amendment H-1287 to amendment H-1271. H.J. 975. |
2019-04-23 | House | Point of order raised on H-1287 to amendment H-1271, ruled not germane. H.J. 974. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1287 to amendment H-1271 filed. H.J. 974. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1283 to amendment H-1271 lost. H.J. 974. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1283 to amendment H-1271 filed. H.J. 973. |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 973. |
2019-04-23 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 981. |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of amendment H-1274 to amendment H-1271. H.J. 972. |
2019-04-23 | House | Point of order raised on H-1274 to amendment H-1271, ruled not germane. H.J. 972. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1274 to amendment H-1271 filed. H.J. 972. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1281 to amendment H-1271 lost. H.J. 972. |
2019-04-23 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 971. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1281 to amendment H-1271 filed. H.J. 971. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1280 to amendment H-1271 lost. H.J. 971. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1280 to amendment H-1271 filed. H.J. 970. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1279 to amendment H-1271 lost. H.J. 970. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1279 to amendment H-1271 filed. H.J. 969. |
2019-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1271 filed. H.J. 947. |
2019-04-19 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee amendment H-1255 filed. H.J. 926. |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 925. |
2019-04-17 | House | NOBA: House Sub |
2019-04-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-04-17 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Anderson, Bossman, Hite, Holt, James, Kacena, Sexton and Sunde. H.J. 900. |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 861. |
2019-04-15 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2019-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 848. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 953. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 950. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3154, ruled not germane. S.J. 950. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3159 filed, adopted. S.J. 950. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3154 filed. S.J. 928. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 889. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 889. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1255 (Related) 2019-04-04 - NOBA: Senate Sub