IA SF629 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to permits for vehicles of excessive size and weight, including vehicles transporting raw forest products, and providing for fees. (Formerly SSB 1045, SF 184.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to permits for vehicles of excessive size and weight, including vehicles transporting raw forest products, and providing for fees. (Formerly SSB 1045, SF 184.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1103. |
2019-04-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1002. |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 69 nays 31. H.J. 1000. |
2019-04-24 | House | Substituted for HF 777. H.J. 999. |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 950. |
2019-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 949. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1058. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 12. S.J. 1057. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1010. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1008. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1045 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 184. S.J. 236.
SF184 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 629. S.J. 1010.
HSB256 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
HF777 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
SF184 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 629. S.J. 1010.
HSB256 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
HF777 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.