IA SF637 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1151.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1151.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the gross weight of special trucks, and providing fees. (Formerly SF 83, SF 187.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the gross weight of special trucks, and providing fees. (Formerly SF 83, SF 187.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1151. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | HF 769 substituted. S.J. 1150. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 769. S.J. 1137. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1074. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1073. |
Same As/Similar To
SF83 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 187. S.J. 237.
HF75 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF187 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 637. S.J. 1074.
HF483 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
HF769 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
HF75 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF187 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 637. S.J. 1074.
HF483 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
HF769 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF637 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF637.html |