IA SJR10 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 18. S.J. 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 18. S.J. 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms. (See SJR 18.)
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the right of the people to keep and bear arms. (See SJR 18.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 18. S.J. 381. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 186. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 170. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR3 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 549.
SJR18 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 815.
HJR13 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 549.
SJR18 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 815.
HJR13 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 549.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SJR10 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SJR10.html |