IA SSB1010 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF126
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the timing of physical examinations for licensed or registered child care facility personnel.(See SF 126.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the timing of physical examinations for licensed or registered child care facility personnel.(See SF 126.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 126. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 11:00AM Room 315. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Jochum. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB10 (Related) 2023-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
SF126 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 1091.
SF126 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 1091.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1010 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1010.html |