IA SSB1113 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF491
Note: Legislation replaced by SF338
Note: Legislation replaced by SF338
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sale or lease of real estate by regulatory agency officials and employees to persons subject to the agency's regulatory authority, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 338.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sale or lease of real estate by regulatory agency officials and employees to persons subject to the agency's regulatory authority, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 338.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 338. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 12:30PM RM 111. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, R., Cournoyer, and Giddens. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB152 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 334.
HF491 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF338 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 816.
HF491 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF338 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 816.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1113 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1113.html |