IA SSB1188 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF544
Note: Legislation replaced by HF655
Note: Legislation replaced by HF655
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 544.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 544.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for business organizations, including limited liability companies, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 544.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for business organizations, including limited liability companies, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 544.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 544. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 10:30AM Room 315. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Zaun, Shipley, and Weiner. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Shipley, and Weiner. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB207 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 655.
SF544 (Replaced by) 2023-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 997.
HF655 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
SF544 (Replaced by) 2023-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 997.
HF655 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1188 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1188.html |