IA SSB3018 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2559
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the revocation or suspension of the certification of a law enforcement officer.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the revocation or suspension of the certification of a law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Tabled until future meeting. []. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 3:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Evans. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB550 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2559.
HF2559 (Replaced by) 2024-02-28 - Amendment H-8099 filed. H.J. 453.
HF2559 (Replaced by) 2024-02-28 - Amendment H-8099 filed. H.J. 453.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3018 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3018.html |