IA SSB3027 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2170
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2460
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2460
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2170.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2170.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to human trafficking including parole and work release and victim counselors, and guardian ad litem appointments for prosecuting witnesses with mental disabilities.(See SF 2170.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to human trafficking including parole and work release and victim counselors, and guardian ad litem appointments for prosecuting witnesses with mental disabilities.(See SF 2170.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2170. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 4:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Petersen, and Shipley. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB530 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2460.
SF2170 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 903.
HF2460 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Fiscal note.
SF2170 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 903.
HF2460 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3027 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3027.html |